THE POPLE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1097114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Patrick Mukholi Trustee 26 September 2020
ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TRUST, WINKFIELD Received: On time
THE WINKFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
WINKFIELD PAROCHIAL CHARITY Received: On time
NIGEL ATKINSON Trustee 01 September 2015
THE WINKFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
CHARITY OF HUGH PRESCOTT ELLIOTT (FOR ALLOTMENTS) Received: On time
WINKFIELD PAROCHIAL CHARITY Received: On time
Kathryn Laura Harris Trustee 25 April 2019
WINDSOR THEATRE GUILD Received: On time
THE WINKFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
WINKFIELD PAROCHIAL CHARITY Received: On time
LESLEY PHILPOT Trustee 31 January 2018
THE WINKFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
WINKFIELD PAROCHIAL CHARITY Received: On time
LYNN JENKINS Chair 16 October 2014
THE CHARLOTTE PRATT MEMORIAL HALL Overdue by 403 days
THE WINKFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
WINKFIELD PAROCHIAL CHARITY Received: On time
Simon Mark Jerrum Trustee 01 October 2020
THE WINKFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
WINKFIELD PAROCHIAL CHARITY Received: On time
ANGELA JANE MICHIE Trustee
THE WINKFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
WINKFIELD PAROCHIAL CHARITY Received: On time
Jonathan Hemsley Trustee 19 July 2018
FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S WINKFIELD Received: On time
THE CHARLOTTE PRATT MEMORIAL HALL Overdue by 403 days
THE WINKFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
WINKFIELD PAROCHIAL CHARITY Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WINKFIELD, CRANBOURNE AND CHAVEY DOWN Overdue by 38 days
Juliet Alison Blakemore Trustee 17 December 2020
ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TRUST, WINKFIELD Received: On time
THE WINKFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
WINKFIELD PAROCHIAL CHARITY Received: On time