SYRACUSE UNIVERSITY (USA) LONDON PROGRAM

Charity number: 1088366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £3.90m £5.05m £5.91m £5.82m £6.17m
Total expenditure £4.01m £5.16m £5.80m £6.22m £5.87m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £75.51k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.74m £4.92m £5.75m £5.76m £6.14m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £132.09k £152.73k £64.06k £35.83k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £166.73k £201 £47 £107 £60
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.01m £5.16m £5.80m £6.22m £5.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £65.35k £68.38k £112.89k £98.65k £73.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £10.91k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0