SYRACUSE UNIVERSITY (USA) LONDON PROGRAM

Charity number: 1088366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL EDWARD HARRIS Trustee 20 March 2015 None on record
RANI RAAD Trustee 12 April 2011 None on record
ERIKA ADRIENNE WILKENS Trustee 04 December 2018 None on record
Steven Jay Bennett Trustee 17 December 2020 None on record
SUSAN DEAN HARDING Trustee 20 March 2015 None on record
RICHARD ALEXANDER CASSELL Trustee
ST PAUL'S SCHOOL Received: On time
AMIR RAHNAMAY-AZAR Trustee 02 May 2017 None on record
DAVID JULIAN BUCHLER Trustee
FRIENDS OF THE ISRAEL OPERA TRUST Received: 67 days late
UK FRIENDS OF THE PERES INSTITUTE FOR PEACE Received: 47 days late
THE WESTERN MARBLE ARCH SYNAGOGUE Received: On time
ROSEDEAN LIMITED Received: On time