Financial history BOOST FELIXSTOWE LTD

Charity number: 1083875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £36.11k £28.11k £29.51k £32.60k £38.86k
Total expenditure £42.40k £33.03k £33.75k £33.93k £33.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.00k £2.50k