Financial history ST MARY COMMUNITY HALLS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1087633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £62.39k £58.24k £55.09k £50.51k £55.32k
Total expenditure £50.56k £49.51k £60.81k £65.79k £50.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A