THE PRIESTLY FRATERNITY OF ST PETER

Charity number: 1083419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £21.73k £26.69k £486.07k £32.26k £44.48k
Total expenditure £33.40k £33.58k £34.88k £42.04k £53.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A