Financial history WATFORD INDIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1092253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.11k £592 £3.15k £3.35k £360
Total expenditure £3.90k £700 £1.96k £3.48k £204
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A