BRITISH DALMATIAN WELFARE

Charity number: 1086519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Rose Trustee 29 May 2018 None on record
Marion Wildey Trustee 12 August 2014 None on record
SIMON HIPKISS Trustee None on record
ANNE GURNSEY Chair None on record
Professor Jeffery William Brooks Trustee 11 February 2020 None on record
Julie Hopkin Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Joan Brooks Trustee 08 April 2018 None on record
Denise Elliott Trustee 08 April 2018 None on record
CHRISTINE ANN BREDEN Trustee None on record
Maggi de Rozario Trustee 12 August 2014 None on record