Financial history STANLEY HOUSE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1088514
Charity reporting is overdue by 510 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.81k £3.27k £8.96k £522 £58.63k
Total expenditure £5.08k £6.65k £6.11k £5.30k £11.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A