Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST THOMAS A BECKET TILSHEAD

Charity number: 1083561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.16k £3.16k £1.94k £3.00k £1.32k
Total expenditure £367 £367 £65 £6.09k £6.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A