Financial history THE CLAY CROSS TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1084489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £5.45k £4.18k £4.45k £5.34k £4.88k
Total expenditure £5.53k £3.92k £4.26k £4.78k £4.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A