Accounts and annual returns THE SUTTON COLDFIELD SCHOOL FARM (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1084520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 24 January 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 17 April 2020 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required