Financial history THE SUTTON COLDFIELD SCHOOL FARM (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1084520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £4.39k £3.39k £3.05k £3.05k £1.43k
Total expenditure £4.58k £3.16k £3.07k £3.07k £1.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A