Financial history LONDON NORTH WEST HEALTHCARE CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1083634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £802.04k £1.05m £1.02m £947.71k £1.91m
Total expenditure £1.44m £1.55m £2.51m £1.59m £873.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £330.09k £534.63k £562.70k £558.36k £1.66m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £177.02k £130.28k £0
Income - Charitable activities £180.48k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £291.43k £279.24k £281.53k £259.07k £253.64k
Income - Other £0 £234.98k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £53.29k £164.40k £242.42k £94.23k £96.67k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.36m £1.33m £2.18m £1.33m £771.76k
Expenditure - Raising funds £71.59k £223.41k £324.29k £253.39k £91.44k
Expenditure - Governance £5.40k £5.00k £0 £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £36.02k £0 £31.43k £30.49k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £5.00k £6.80k £10.46k