Accounts and annual returns THE CHEAM VILLAGE 'A' TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1084120
Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 207 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 207 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 08 October 2020 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required