THE ST MARY'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1087687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.93k £1.87k £46.32k £1.50k £480
Total expenditure £34.83k £28.83k £29.58k £35.21k £21.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A