BRITISH LIMBLESS EX-SERVICE MEN'S ASSOCIATION (BLESMA)

Charity number: 1084189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.66m £9.50m £8.80m £9.84m £4.76m
Total expenditure £5.34m £4.41m £5.97m £6.23m £5.23m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £411.05k £413.04k £277.34k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.61m £8.66m £7.96m £5.90m £4.06m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £277.55k £0 £0 £413.04k £65.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £742.52k £800.11k £787.99k £909.62k £475.93k
Income - Other £29.15k £36.43k £57.81k £2.61m £153.43k
Income - Legacies £3.56m £5.78m £5.61m £4.24m £2.23m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.47m £3.53m £4.92m £5.17m £4.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £874.36k £876.13k £1.05m £1.06m £1.07m
Expenditure - Governance £83.63k £42.61k £73.47k £51.16k £62.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £88.96k £104.66k £109.91k £110.33k £113.14k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0