BRITISH LIMBLESS EX-SERVICE MEN'S ASSOCIATION (BLESMA)

Charity number: 1084189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Laura Grant Trustee 11 June 2017 None on record
Stephen White Trustee 13 June 2020 None on record
General Sir Adrian John Bradshaw KCB OBE DL Chair 11 June 2017
THE KING'S ROYAL HUSSARS MUSEUM CIO Recently registered
Robert John Watts Trustee 25 June 2015 None on record
WILLIAM LLOYD DIXON Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record
ANDREW KENNETH MUDD BEM Trustee None on record
Miles Courtenay Ambler Trustee 10 June 2018 None on record
Stuart Jeremy Croxford Trustee 13 June 2020 None on record
COLIN ROUSE MBE Trustee None on record