Accounts and annual returns ST ATHANASIUS COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity number: 1086561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 13 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 08 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 01 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 01 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 02 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 02 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window