Trustees THE KINGSTEIGNTON VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1085022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev MARK SMITH Chair 18 April 2012
None on record
Toby Alexander Smith Trustee 11 March 2019
None on record
KENNETH ALBERT JONES Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
JOHN FRANCIS STACEY Trustee 23 October 2006
None on record
MS LIZ ROLLASON Trustee 24 May 2006
None on record
ROBERT CHARLES THOMPSON Trustee 15 March 2001
None on record