THE BRITISH PTERIDOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1092399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £28.43k £29.00k £26.73k £32.43k £28.18k
Total expenditure £24.50k £21.25k £22.63k £30.30k £25.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A