Trustees THE BRITISH PTERIDOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1092399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Thomas Reeve | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Sutton | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Edgington | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr BARRY WRIGHT | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Professor Mary Gibby | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Gavin Hill | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bridget Laue | Trustee | 12 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Julian Phillip Reed | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Bennallick | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Blake | Trustee | 06 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT SYKES | Trustee | 14 August 2012 |
|
|||||
ALEC EDWARD GREENING | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sue Dockerill | Trustee | 14 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brian Dockerill | Trustee | 14 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Jean Evans | Trustee | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heather McHaffie | Trustee | 19 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HENRY RICKARD BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYAN DUDLEY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Adrian Dyer | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON MARY PAUL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROB COOKE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROGER GOLDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILL SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.