Financial history HCT GROUP

Charity number: 1091318
Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £44.19m £49.90m £63.19m £76.72m £123.71m
Total expenditure £43.98m £49.15m £62.35m £78.29m £133.74m
Income from government contracts £40.14m £31.95m £58.35m £56.74m £96.05m
Income from government grants £527.03k £271.18k £538.23k £2.16m £1.26m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £571.13k £571.13k £2.45m £211.62k
Income - Other trading activities £527.03k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £43.67m £49.33m £62.36m £74.27m £120.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £10.19k £56
Income - Other -£1.92k £0 £0 £0 £3.23m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £43.98m £49.12m £62.35m £78.29m £133.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £85.24k £61.23k £161.60k £155.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £31.11k £0 £0 £0