Accounts and annual returns PEOPLES CLUB OF NIGERIA CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1093698
Charity reporting is overdue by 244 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 April 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 08 April 2021 373 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 09 March 2020 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 25 April 2018 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required