Financial history PEOPLES CLUB OF NIGERIA CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1093698
Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £33.89k £8.95k £21.05k £23.55k £19.38k
Total expenditure £37.26k £8.95k £10.32k £20.38k £26.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A