THE TAVISTOCK PHYSICALLY CHALLENGED GROUP

Charity number: 1085954
Charity reporting is 739 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Not yet received
8 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not yet received
8 days overdue
Annual return 30 April 2019 Not yet received
373 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not yet received
373 days overdue
Annual return 30 April 2018 Not yet received
739 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not yet received
739 days overdue
Annual return 30 April 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 18 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)