THE TAVISTOCK PHYSICALLY CHALLENGED GROUP

Charity number: 1085954
Charity reporting is overdue by 887 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £1.28k £3.12k £3.60k £4.52k £1.57k
Total expenditure £3.25k £3.60k £2.25k £2.32k £1.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A