Accounts and annual returns POURCHISTA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1086542
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 210 days
Annual return 20 March 2020 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 20 March 2019 19 May 2020 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 20 March 2018 19 May 2020 485 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 20 March 2017 02 April 2018 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2017 Not Required