Financial history POURCHISTA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1086542
Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/03/2016 20/03/2017 20/03/2018 20/03/2019 20/03/2020
Total gross income £15.83k £140 £140 £152 £173
Total expenditure £20.00k £0 £0 £3.00k £3.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A