LONG ROCK MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1093057
Charity reporting is overdue by 788 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 422 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 422 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 788 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 788 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 06 June 2021 1042 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 18 September 2018 415 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required