LONG ROCK MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1093057
Charity reporting is overdue by 789 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £535 £1.49k £442 £403 £0
Total expenditure £856 £769 £807 £802 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0