Financial history DACORUM DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1085882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £250.14k £240.12k £252.54k £285.50k £355.43k
Total expenditure £263.46k £258.37k £248.73k £288.24k £336.96k
Income from government contracts £233.33k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £235.00k £177.00k £279.01k £350.01k