THE BRITISH MUSEUM FRIENDS

Charity number: 1086080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.92m £5.16m £6.75m £5.71m £5.46m
Total expenditure £4.66m £5.36m £6.32m £5.66m £5.83m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £189.09k £219.64k £1.10m £958.71k £360.80k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.72m £4.93m £5.65m £4.75m £5.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.62k £7.45k £3.94k £7.84k £10.68k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £28.00k £75.96k £978.31k £919.93k £164.52k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.65m £5.34m £6.31m £3.79m £5.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.97k £20.88k £14.39k £2.06k £8.30k
Expenditure - Governance £12.89k £9.96k £9.81k £10.20k £14.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.34m £3.83m £4.84m £2.29m £4.26m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.86m £0