Accounts and annual returns CHALFONT ST GILES JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1086120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required