Financial history CHALFONT ST GILES JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1086120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £19.14k £22.02k £14.71k £17.07k £8.44k
Total expenditure £7.79k £10.84k £5.40k £5.35k £18.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A