Accounts and annual returns ST CATHERINES HILL COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1088266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window