Financial history CREATIVE KIDS OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB

Charity number: 1087158
Charity reporting is overdue by 1605 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/07/2004 20/07/2005 31/03/2006 20/07/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £62.22k £44.76k £7.38k £5.82k £3.30k
Total expenditure £58.14k £48.84k £3.35k £3.72k £3.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A