Financial history GROUNDSWELL NETWORK SUPPORT UK

Charity number: 1089987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £837.77k £998.18k £1.07m £1.73m £2.11m
Total expenditure £815.41k £933.10k £1.00m £1.33m £1.83m
Income from government contracts £40.00k £411.22k £362.59k £647.46k £727.48k
Income from government grants £57.50k £62.51k £67.19k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £140.20k £219.57k £237.76k £283.50k £233.20k
Income - Other trading activities £1.79k £30.92k £1.19k £3.43k £50
Income - Charitable activities £695.76k £778.61k £834.05k £1.44m £1.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26 £0 £9 £77 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £772.65k £837.81k £902.14k £1.21m £1.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £42.75k £95.29k £101.88k £111.21k £113.47k
Expenditure - Governance £6.91k £10.16k £9.97k £0 £7.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0