Financial history WEST YORKSHIRE BAT GROUP

Charity number: 1090109
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.00k £11.82k £11.61k £9.63k £11.35k
Total expenditure £4.68k £19.79k £2.58k £18.04k £5.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A