Trustees WEST YORKSHIRE BAT GROUP

Charity number: 1090109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Proctor Trustee 28 March 2018
None on record
Dr Colin Charles Townsley Trustee 19 February 2014
None on record
Diane Wood Trustee 09 October 2013
None on record
ANDREW PERRY Trustee 25 October 2012
None on record
PAUL REDMOND Trustee 21 February 2007
None on record
JANE LIDDLE Trustee 27 April 2005
None on record