Financial history MUSIC FOR LIFE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1090556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £326.39k £343.72k £199.73k £213.77k £197.65k
Total expenditure £306.98k £337.01k £230.32k £199.18k £204.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A