Financial history SUNDERLAND HEADLIGHT

Charity number: 1090717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £109.56k £111.91k £79.33k £137.99k £77.94k
Total expenditure £93.31k £116.17k £115.26k £118.75k £115.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.92k £24.00k £25.00k £25.00k £41.66k