Financial history ST HELENS CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1089663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.29m £1.30m £1.25m £1.25m £1.26m
Total expenditure £1.31m £1.25m £1.31m £1.26m £1.15m
Income from government contracts £806.47k £889.86k £1.05m £1.04m £998.12k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £15.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £53.62k £64.15k £73.95k £60.39k £69.02k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £12.11k £10.87k
Income - Charitable activities £1.23m £1.24m £1.17m £1.18m £1.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £29 £52 £155 £196 £122
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £27.12k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.30m £1.24m £1.30m £1.25m £1.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.14k £9.17k £10.57k £9.26k £5.87k
Expenditure - Governance £5.92k £6.01k £0 £6.51k £6.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £27.12k