Financial history THE OXFORDSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1087554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/03/2018 27/03/2019 27/03/2020 27/03/2021 27/03/2022
Total gross income £21.95m £22.51m £24.24m £25.37m £24.45m
Total expenditure £21.86m £22.40m £24.39m £25.50m £24.49m
Income from government contracts £21.59m £22.13m £23.86m £25.01m £24.45m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £21.94m £22.48m £24.21m £25.01m £24.45m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.29k £31.98k £29.00k £0 £945
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £365.80k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.86m £22.40m £24.22m £25.50m £24.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.00k £24.15k £13.82k £15.57k £16.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £169.12k £0 £0