Trustees THE OXFORDSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1087554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julian Alexander Pearce Trustee 02 October 2020
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Anna Humphries Trustee 24 April 2019
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Tracey Wardle Trustee 08 June 2018
None on record
Philippa Spratley Trustee 20 February 2018
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Kerry Margaret Dearden Trustee 01 February 2017
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Daniel Hayes Trustee 01 September 2015
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
KEVIN BOLT Trustee 12 March 2014
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
MILLIE WENTWORTH-STANLEY Trustee
THE ORDERS OF ST JOHN CARE TRUST
Received: On time