LEGAL ACTION

Charity number: 1100780
Charity is insolvent
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2015
Total gross income £36.93k £38.55k £117.82k £134.42k £42.37k
Total expenditure £18.63k £51.97k £100.37k £135.41k £115.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0