Financial history PURSUING INDEPENDENT PATHS

Charity number: 1088592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £972.47k £1.21m £1.19m £1.18m £1.46m
Total expenditure £951.47k £1.08m £1.06m £1.08m £1.21m
Income from government contracts £634.04k £680.88k £828.51k £844.68k £843.07k
Income from government grants £45.00k N/A N/A £47.03k £20.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £168.35k £519.79k £354.79k £308.31k £582.56k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £803.89k £686.94k £832.31k £844.98k £872.97k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £222 £0 £1.15k £1.76k £798
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £27.09k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £905.03k £1.00m £919.85k £995.13k £1.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £46.45k £75.16k £141.05k £88.33k £81.18k
Expenditure - Governance £49.99k £19.15k £28.09k £36.34k £26.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.45k £0 £14.15k