2ND ST CLEARS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1088869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required