Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S CHURCH CHARLESTOWN

Charity number: 1088846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 June 2019 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 June 2019 133 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required