Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S CHURCH CHARLESTOWN

Charity number: 1088846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.36k £73.98k £10.60k £9.09k £19.89k
Total expenditure £4.53k £53.52k £23.07k £8.40k £2.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A